Accounts and annual returns RIFT VALLEY NEWCASTLE JUSTICE PROJECT

Charity number: 1111778
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 10 September 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 17 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 21 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required