RIFT VALLEY NEWCASTLE JUSTICE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of education and assistance in Rift Valley, Kenya. Assistance with Rift Valley Law Society Children's Justice and Legal Aid Project. Overseas aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 21 October 2005: Standard registration
- 04 December 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JUSTICE FOR CHILDREN (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.97k | £89.55k | £17.37k | £9.88k | £3.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.91k | £30.79k | £25.36k | £33.68k | £11.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 10 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 17 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 21 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) IN KENYA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (B) OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (C) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (D) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (E) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; (F) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; (G) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; (H) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; (I) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (J) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; (K) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; (L) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (M) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF THE PROHIBITIONS ON TORTURE, SLAVERY, EXTRA JUDICIAL KILLING, ARBITRARY DETENTION AND DISAPPEARANCE. 3.2 SUPPORTING THE EDUCATION OF THE KENYAN PUBLIC IN LEGAL MATTERS AND MEMBERS OF THE KENYAN PROFESSION AND JUSTICE SYSTEM IN THE INTERESTS OF THE KENYAN PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING IN THE MAINTENANCE OF HIGH STANDARDS OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN THE KENYAN LEGAL PROFESSION. 3.3 SUPPORTING AND ENGAGING IN CHARITABLE WORK TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS IN KENYA SUCH AS ASSISTANCE IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF LAW, GENERAL PROMOTION OF LEGAL EDUCATION AND PRO BONO ASSISTANCE FOR PEOPLE IN NEED PARTICULARLY WOMEN AND CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window