Accounts and annual returns SHOEBURYNESS COMMUNITY CENTRES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1110798
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 01 August 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 August 2022 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 01 August 2022 732 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required