Financial history SHOEBURYNESS COMMUNITY CENTRES ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1110798
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £7.83k £3.44k £1.67k £2.50k £882
Total expenditure £7.14k £7.00k £1.72k £1.36k £7.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A