ASHTON HALL ORGAN RESTORATION PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are restoring the nationally important Ashton Hall Organ in Lancaster to its former glory. We hold fortnightly free lunchtime concerts, with retiring collection, on Wednesdays 1230 to 1330 hours throughout the year. Details of these concerts may be found by contacting Lancaster Town Hall or view organrecitals.com Concerts performed are Organ, Organ & solo instruments, Piano, Ensemble.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 April 2006: Standard registration
- AHORP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stanley Kirby | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tom Huckerby | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek Matthews | Trustee | 10 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.39k | £4.39k | £4.14k | £1.37k | £319 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.01k | £3.47k | £3.82k | £106 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 658 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 658 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO ASSIST, PROMOTE AND ADVANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION OF THE 1909 NORMAN AND BEARD PIPE ORGAN SUITED WITHIN THE ASHTON HALL, LANCASTER; 2. TO PROVIDE FOR THE FUTURE MAINTENANCE OF THE ORGAN, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
LANCASTER AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
195 Brodie Avenue
Mossley Hill
LIVERPOOL
L18 4RQ
- Phone:
- 0151 7243917
- Email:
- cwporganist@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
townhall@lancaster.guv.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window