Accounts and annual returns TYNE TEES ANIMAL TRUST

Charity number: 1111362
Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
Annual return 29 December 2022 12 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 29 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 December 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 29 December 2019 04 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2019 Not Required