Financial history THE ADVENTURE DOLPHIN (PANGBOURNE) CHARITY

Charity Number: 1111555
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013
Total gross income £29.45k £178.49k £5.01k £9.34k £104
Total expenditure £2.22k £316.38k £1.90k £996 £11.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A