Financial history THE SEEING EAR LIMITED

Charity number: 1111371
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £233.22k £171.74k £126.82k £67.21k £1.90k
Total expenditure £173.99k £160.82k £148.89k £105.83k £67.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A