THE SEEING EAR LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of print disabled persons by the provision of printed items in an accessible electronic/alternative format.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 September 2005: Standard registration
- 04 May 2022: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
- THE SEEING EAR (Working name)
- TSE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.22k | £171.74k | £126.82k | £67.21k | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.99k | £160.82k | £148.89k | £105.83k | £67.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 25 February 2022 | 452 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 25 February 2022 | 452 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 20 December 2019 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 20 December 2019 | 20 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 12 JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF VISUALLY IMPAIRED PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF BOOKS IN AN ACCESSIBLE ELECTRONIC/ALTERNATIVE FORMAT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window