WALSALL FOSTER CARER'S ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
3.1 FOR THE BENEFIT OF FOSTER CARERS AND THE CHILDREN WITHIN THEIR CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ("THE BENEFICIARIES")BY THE PROVISION,OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION,OF ADVICE,ASSISTANCE TRAININGSERVICE,SUPPORT,REPRESENTATION AND ADVOCACY ON GENERAL POLICY ISSUES,AND INFORMATION TO MEET THE NEEDS OF THE BENEFICIARIES;AND TO LIAISE AND WORK CLOSELY WITH THE RELEVANT STATUTORY AND OTHER AGENCIES .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Walsall
Governance
- 18 November 2005: Standard registration
- 30 August 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WFCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.42k | £21.59k | £25.35k | £15.79k | £2.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.51k | £27.74k | £21.97k | £7.98k | £29.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £7.43k | £13.75k | £2.54k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 19 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 22 OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE GROUP IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR; 3.1.1 FOR THE BENEFIT OF FOSTER CARERS AND THE CHILDREN IN THEIR CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ('THE BENEFICIARIES') BY THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION, OF ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, SERVICE, SUPPORT, REPRESENTATION AND ADVOCACY ON GENERAL POLICY ISSUES, AND INFORMATION TO MEET THE NEEDS OF THE BENEFICIARIES; AND TO LIASE AND WORK CLOSELY WITH RELEVANT STATUTORY AND OTHER AGENCIES WITH A VIEW TO PARTICIPATING IN AND FACILITATING THE FORMULATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF POLICIES PERTAINING TO THE WORK OF THE BENEFICIARIES. 3.1.2 TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO SUBSTITUTE CARE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE BENEFICIARIES; AND THE RELIEF OF THE BENEFICIARIES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window