Financial history THE SECKFORD FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1110964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £22.78m £13.49m £14.62m £15.41m £17.39m
Total expenditure £23.95m £13.36m £14.29m £15.86m £16.88m
Income from government contracts £96.69k £84.24k £58.32k £197.94k £311.64k
Income from government grants £9.99m £241.58k £53.70k £5.83k £3.22k
Income - Donations and legacies £704.64k £526.40k £786.18k £28.28k £50.01k
Income - Other trading activities £139.16k £452.72k £27.69k £19.97k £38.96k
Income - Charitable activities £21.72m £12.32m £13.59m £15.11m £16.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £218.85k £176.88k £212.50k £248.88k £315.13k
Income - Other £0 £17.07k £250 £1.14k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.87m £13.35m £14.29m £15.82m £16.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £73.13k £15.91k £1.93k £11.69k £13.67k
Expenditure - Governance £215.39k £121.78k £85.89k £75.36k £76.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £33.43k £0 £0 £0 £500
Expenditure - Investment management £2.31k £15.91k £1.93k £11.69k £13.67k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £31.70k £10.69k