DOROTHY MILES CULTURAL CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WORKING WITH PEOPLE OF ALL AGES TO ENHANCE COMMUNICATION AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DEAF AND HEARING PEOPLE THROUGH SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES. THE CHARITY PROVIDES BRITISH SIGN LANGUAGE COURSES UP TO LEVEL 3 TOGETHER AND AD HOC SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE YEAR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 August 2005: Standard registration
- 03 February 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.38k | £104.66k | £62.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.57k | £98.45k | £72.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BY:- 3.I THE EDUCATION AND RAISING OF AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3.II. THE PROVISION TO BOTH DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PERSONS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF TRAINING IN BRITISH SIGN LANGUAGE; 3.III. THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME FACILITIES TO SUCH PERSONS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE; 3.IV. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNICATION , CREATIVITY, CONFIDENCE, TRAINING , A SENSE OF COMMUNITY AND A MUTUAL AWARENESS BETWEEN DEAF AND HEARING PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SURREY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window