LEASIDE COLTS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a local Football Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 12 September 2005: Standard registration
- LEASDIE COLTS FOOTBALL CLUB (Previous name)
- LONDON DOCKERS ATHLETIC CLUB (A.C.) (Previous name)
- WAPPING FOOTBALL CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
david micallef | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE GLOVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/06/2020 | 02/06/2021 | 02/06/2022 | 02/06/2023 | 02/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £375 | £0 | £10 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £375 | £0 | £10 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 June 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 June 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 June 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 June 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 22ND AUGUST 2005. AS AMENDED ON 17 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PERSONS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED, RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING, TRAINING AND COACHING OF FOOTBALL AND SUCH OTHER SPORTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Little Gaynes Lane
UPMINSTER
RM14 2JR
- Phone:
- 07984000989
- Email:
- rm125er@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window