CHILDREN'S HOPE UK LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advance and organise education and training programmes for underpriviliged children in Bangladesh; advance healthcare for all sponsored children and their families in Bangladesh; relieve poverty by setting up post-education placement schemes for qualified pupils in Bangladesh;set up community projects to help develop small business opportunities in Bangladesh
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 23 August 2005: Standard registration
- CHILDRENS HOPE (2005) LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAFIQUL HASSAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PARA HAMILTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.40k | £156.94k | £156.12k | £157.29k | £158.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.53k | £52.02k | £81.52k | £66.13k | £104.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 03 June 2024 | 765 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 May 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 May 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY INITIATING EDUCATION PROGRAMMES FOR UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN IN SUPPORT OF PRIMARY, SECONDARY AND FURTHER EDUCATION IN BANGLADESH, TO ORGANISE TRAINING TO HELP DEVELOP EXTRA-CURRICULAR SKILLS NECESSARY TO ENTER INTO MAINSTREAM EMPLOYMENT SECTORS; TO ADVANCE HEALTHCARE FOR ALL SPONSORED CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES, ORGANISE PREVENTIVE PROJECTS TO ENCOURAGE HEALTHY LIVING AND SET UP COMMUNITY BASED REHABILITATION PROGRAMMES FOR VULNERABLE CHILDREN; TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY SETTING UP POST-EDUCATION PLACEMENT SCHEMES FOR QUALIFIED PUPILS TO GENERATE POSSIBLE EMPLOYMENT, TO SET UP COMMUNITY PROJECTS SUCH AS 'MICRO CREDIT' GRANT AND LOAN SCHEMES TO HELP DEVELOP SMALL BUSINESS OPPORTUNITIES.
Area of benefit
BANGLADESH
Contact information
- Address:
-
110-112 PARKWAY
CAMDEN
LONDON
NW1 7AN
- Phone:
- 07495621044
- Email:
- ish@echosourcing.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window