Financial history THE LEADERS OF WORSHIP AND PREACHERS HOMES

Charity number: 1112378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.53m £2.63m £2.87m £3.29m £3.07m
Total expenditure £2.35m £2.36m £2.54m £2.86m £2.96m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.51k £152.47k £33.78k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £106.14k £46.18k £118.09k £188.20k £75.80k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.41m £2.42m £2.72m £3.09m £2.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.61k £6.89k £1.53k £9.05k £11.56k
Income - Other £0 £152.47k £33.78k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £13.72k £20.00k £160.00k £58.18k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.34m £2.35m £2.53m £2.85m £2.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.63k £6.73k £5.37k £7.86k £14.36k
Expenditure - Governance £144.30k £129.91k £88.49k £107.11k £124.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.65k £2.40k £2.02k £2.66k £8.16k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0