THE LEADERS OF WORSHIP AND PREACHERS HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of housing and associated amenities to those involved in worship/preaching and their dependents/relatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£3,072,977
Donations and legacies | £75.80k | |
Charitable activities | £2.99m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £11.56k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,962,861
Raising funds | £14.36k | |
Charitable activities | £2.95m | |
Other | £0 |
£82,394 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £14.36k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.95m | |
Retained for future use | £110.12k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £14.36k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.95m | |
Retained for future use | £192.51k |
People

86 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 2005: Standard registration
- LWP HOMES (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Colin Braithwaite | Chair | 08 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Julie Ann Close-Mitchell | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Graham Evans | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Charles Greet | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Chapman | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARIE ARMITAGE | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Jenny Benfield | Trustee | 18 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53m | £2.63m | £2.87m | £3.29m | £3.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.35m | £2.36m | £2.54m | £2.86m | £2.96m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.51k | £152.47k | £33.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £106.14k | £46.18k | £118.09k | £188.20k | £75.80k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.41m | £2.42m | £2.72m | £3.09m | £2.99m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.61k | £6.89k | £1.53k | £9.05k | £11.56k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £152.47k | £33.78k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £13.72k | £20.00k | £160.00k | £58.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.34m | £2.35m | £2.53m | £2.85m | £2.95m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.63k | £6.73k | £5.37k | £7.86k | £14.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £144.30k | £129.91k | £88.49k | £107.11k | £124.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.65k | £2.40k | £2.02k | £2.66k | £8.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.27m | £4.23m | £4.13m | £4.06m | £4.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £398.54k | £450.86k | £431.59k | £604.16k | £686.55k | |
|
Other assets | £422.83k | £678.47k | £1.02m | £875.24k | £606.39k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.33m | -£2.09m | -£1.46m | -£1.48m | -£1.34m | |
|
Total liabilities | £709.24k | £804.93k | £871.27k | £568.83k | £508.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/01/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/09/2014 as amended on 24 May 2018 as amended on 20 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO CARRY ON THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SUCH AS TREATMENT, CARE, ADVICE AND ADVOCACY, FOR THOSE WHO REQUIRE SUCH PROVISION ON ACCOUNT OF SICKNESS, INFIRMITY, OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED, ON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS. PRIORITY SHALL BE GIVEN TO THOSE WHO: 3.1.1 ARE INVOLVED IN LEADING WORSHIP AND/OR PREACHING; 3.1.2 ARE IN TRAINING FOR, OR RETIRED FROM, THE ACTIVITIES OF LEADING WORSHIP AND/OR PREACHING; OR 3.1.3 ARE THE WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, PARENTS, PARENTS IN LAW, CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF PERSONS DESCRIBED IN ARTICLE 3.1.1 OR 3.1.2 ABOVE; PROVIDED THAT THEY ARE OR HAVE BEEN PART OF A CHURCH ORGANISATION HAVING PRINCIPLES OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP, COMMUNION AND FELLOWSHIP AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES AS BEING SIMILAR TO THOSE HELD BY THE METHODIST CHURCH AND WESLEYAN REFORM UNION AND THE LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIPS THAT INCLUDE METHODISTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Winton Avenue
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
SS0 7QU
- Phone:
- 01702342059
- Email:
- homesadmin@lwphomes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window