SCOPE WEST SUSSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to involve, support, and develop people with physical disabilities, particularly cerbral palsy in West Sussex, their families and carers, by providing a focal point for individuals to meet as well as activities and training, and to run a day resource centre for the development of skills, friendship, and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 21 December 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Jones | Chair | 29 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Welch | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Ellison | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Burrows | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Feild | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD KEVIN BURROWS | Trustee | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £318.31k | £291.19k | £291.77k | £325.30k | £307.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.46k | £250.47k | £240.92k | £323.54k | £311.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROVIDE, CAUSE TO BE PROVIDED OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE WITH CEREBRAL PALSY AND RELATED DISABILITIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DECLARED AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF SCOPE; (II) IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR TRAINING IN SKILLS, LEADING, IF POSSIBLE, TO EMPLOYMENT AND INDEPENDENT LIVING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCOPE WEST SUSSEX
SUNRAY BUILDING
LITTLE BREACH
CHICHESTER
PO19 5UA
- Phone:
- 01243775330
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window