PARISH HALLS - RUSHMERE ST ANDREW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings, facilities and open space for hire for the benefit of the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,160 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 August 2005: Standard registration
- TOWER HALL (Working name)
- TOWER HALL - RUSHMERE ST ANDREW (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS M TARLING | Chair | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Last | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Russell Wright | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann Last | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Sharon Lesley Parker | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan Treadaway | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Colbert | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS A COOPER | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR M R BENTLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR J S WITHEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.19k | £81.73k | £87.28k | £63.37k | £92.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.43k | £68.12k | £63.61k | £76.55k | £95.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.54k | £38.88k | £3.00k | £2.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL OR HALLS FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF RUSHMERE ST ANDREW WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY AND ANY OTHER LAND AND BUILDINGS OF THE CHARITY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RUSHMERE ST ANDREW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rushmere Village Hall
Humber Doucy Lane
IPSWICH
IP4 3PD
- Phone:
- 07538 929253
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window