THE TATTON PARK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It applies its funds in the maintenance and conservation of Tatton Park, Knutsford, Cheshire and supports projects which use Tatton Park for education and learning. It supports any other charitable purpose linked with the use of Tatton Park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 19 September 2005: Standard registration
- THE TATTON PARK TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Ward | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NEIL EDWARD TWIGG | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ralph Thompson | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|||||
STEVE WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.28k | £1.55k | £3.82k | £6.18k | £13.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.06k | £3.95k | £10.70k | £17.47k | £16.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: A) THE MAINTENANCE AND CONSERVATION OF TATTON PARK, KNUTSFORD, CHESHIRE WA16 6QN ("TATTON PARK") INCLUDING ITS LAND, BUILDINGS, ARTEFACTS, COLLECTIONS, ENVIRONMENT, NATURAL FEATURES, WILDLIFE AND TRADITIONAL BREEDS OF LIVESTOCK; B) THE USE OF TATTON PARK FOR EDUCATION AND LEARNING INCLUDING SKILLS, PROCESSES AND KNOWLEDGE RELEVANT TO THE HISTORY , MANAGEMENT AND CONSERVATION OF TATTON PARK; C) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE LINKED WITH THE USE OF TATTON PARK.
Area of benefit
TATTON PARK, KNUTSFORD, CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tatton Park
KNUTSFORD
Cheshire
WA16 6QN
- Phone:
- 01625374402
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window