TRANSACTION THEATRE COMPANY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRANSACTION COLLABORATES WITH DIVERSE ARTISTS TO CREATE A TOURING PROGRAMME OF HIGH QUALITY EXPERIMENTAL MULTI-ART FORM QUEER-FEMINIST PERFORMANCE. OUR VISION IS TO CREATE A PERFORMANCE FROM THE PERIPHERY THAT CONTINUALLY RESPONDS TO, AND REFLECTS THE DIVERSITY WITHIN CONTEMPORARY CULTURE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Manchester City
Governance
- 17 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE NAOMI NEILSON | Chair | 17 November 2005 |
|
|
||||
Louise Anderson | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALEXA GORSE | Trustee | 17 November 2005 |
|
|
||||
JOEY HATELEY | Trustee | 12 March 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £15.18k | £4.59k | £19.40k | £40.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13 | £88 | £9.25k | £29.81k | £14.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5TH OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20TH OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, IN THE ISSUES SURROUNDING GENDER IDENTITY BY THE PROVISION OF RELATED PERFORMANCE ART, THEATRE, MULTI-MEDIA PRESENTATIONS AND SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WILTON ROAD
CHORLTON CUM HARDY
MANCHESTER
M21 9GS
- Phone:
- 07814068190
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window