Trustees COMBE MILL SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1111029

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Ralphs | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wheeler | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Charles Richard Stone | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Robert Evans | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ethel Lillian Gruber | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Trowles | Trustee | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY SIMMONS CHARTERED ENGINEER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.