SOMALI COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice and advocacy, youth work, youth activities (i.e. youth club, sports, outing/trips, workshops, peer mentoring), educational link work for secondary schools, family support work, fathers outreach work and other community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 August 2005: Standard registration
- 14 November 2016: Funds received from 1105552 SOMALI ELDERLY AND DISABLED CENTRE
- SOMALI COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohamed Ali Farah | Chair | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abdiwahab Musse | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Khalif Ali Duale | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abdulaziz Jumca Farah | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abdulahi Nur MUSSE | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.50k | £29.35k | £17.23k | £44.77k | £16.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.96k | £18.90k | £24.24k | £44.47k | £19.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.71k | £14.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 MAY 2005 AND 6 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF SOMALI ORIGIN OR DESCENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO: (I) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS (II) PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE (B) PROVIDE RELIEF TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF SOMALI ORIGIN OR DESCENT WITH DRUG OR ALCOHOL ABUSE, BY THE PROVISION OF AN INFORMATION, ADVICE AND COUNSELLING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62A
St. Pauls Crescent
London
NW1 9XZ
- Phone:
- 02034894404
- Email:
- somalicdtrust@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window