TETBURY AREA YOUTH & COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To replace the youth service that was withdrawn by Gloucestershire County Council. In the form of financial and management support to provide and fund professional supervised, well planned recreational, educational and cultural experiences that will elevate young people's life chances and to foster understanding amongst adolescence for the older generation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 May 2006: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF TETBURY YOUTH CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Adam Cox | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Elisabeth Anne Evans | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Scott | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.68k | £25.59k | £11.98k | £30.12k | £56.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.10k | £16.74k | £5.66k | £32.48k | £52.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | £22.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 July 2023 | 474 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 18 July 2023 | 474 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 355 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/12/2005 AS AMENDED ON 15/07/2011
Charitable objects
1 TO BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS (MAINLY YOUTH) OF TETBURY AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2 TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
TETBURY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 The Ferns
TETBURY
Gloucestershire
GL8 8JE
- Phone:
- 07739909047
- Email:
- admin@tayct.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window