KICK4LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kick4Life uses the power of sport to transform the lives of orphans and vulnerable children and young people in Lesotho. This includes health education and HIV prevention, voluntary HIV testing, life-skills development, mentoring and support towards education & employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lesotho
Governance
- 18 November 2005: Standard registration
- K4L (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Craig Morgan | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alden Whittaker-Brown | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WARD | Trustee | 18 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN SAMUEL FISHLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXIS OSWALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MATTHEW LIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.03k | £339.17k | £431.52k | £157.62k | £195.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.20k | £273.71k | £190.35k | £175.31k | £260.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON 22ND JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 17TH OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP, AND DISTRESS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND/OR MATERIAL ASSISTANCE OF THOSE IN NEED AND BY THE COLLECTION, COLLATION AND PUBLIC DISTRIBUTION OF RELATED INFORMATION. (II) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO ISSUES SURROUNDING HIV/AIDS, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVISE TO THOSE AT RISK OR WHO ARE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF HIV/AIDS AND, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE EFFECTED.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Park Avenue
Little Paxton
St. Neots
PE19 6PB
- Phone:
- 07710999169
- Email:
- steve@kick4life.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window