CHESTER-LE-STREET WELLBEING CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation's objects are to promote health and wellbeing through the provision of accessible support, advice and information services. To encourage and empower individual's expressed needs through promoting prevention and recovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £78,685 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 31 August 2005: Standard registration
- 22 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHESTER-LE-STREET AND DURHAM CITY MIND (Previous name)
- CHESTER-LE-STREET MIND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.06k | £313.54k | £317.95k | £240.23k | £81.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.32k | £213.65k | £346.34k | £345.45k | £117.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £42.00k | £78.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 28 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
28 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 19 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 19 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
30 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/08/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT, IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE CHESTER- LE- STREET, DURHAM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window