Accounts and annual returns FERHAM ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1111594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 June 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 09 June 2023 10 May 2024 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2023 10 May 2024 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 June 2022 09 June 2023 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2022 09 June 2023 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 June 2021 30 June 2022 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2021 30 June 2022 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 June 2020 30 June 2022 447 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 June 2020 30 June 2022 447 days late Download Open in new window