FERHAM ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rotherham
Governance
- 06 October 2005: Standard registration
- FICC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIR ZAMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kabir Hussain | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Zar Mahmood | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ABDUL KHALID | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/06/2020 | 09/06/2021 | 09/06/2022 | 09/06/2023 | 09/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.01k | £65.21k | £38.86k | £32.44k | £18.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.22k | £45.77k | £39.90k | £28.66k | £23.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.72k | £32.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 June 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 June 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 09 June 2022 | 09 June 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 June 2022 | 09 June 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 09 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 09 June 2020 | 30 June 2022 | 447 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 June 2020 | 30 June 2022 | 447 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 18TH SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR THOSE FROM MUSLIM COMMUNITIES, WITHIN THE FERHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF ROTHERHAM (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF AN AFTER HOURS STUDY CENTRE. (II) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON THE DANGERS OF SMOKING, SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND PERSONAL HEALTHCARE GENERALLY. (III) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY BODIES AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
FERHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF ROTHERHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 Holmes Lane
ROTHERHAM
S61 1BH
- Phone:
- 07894413789
- Email:
- f.i.c.c@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window