NGAK MANG INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bhutan
- China
- Nepal
Governance
- 19 October 2005: Standard registration
- 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- N.M.I.(GB) (Working name)
- NGAK MANG INSTITUTE OF (GB) (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2007 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON 29TH MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE PEOPLE IN THE HIMALAYAN REGION OF ASIA, BEING NEPAL, CHINA (AND TIBET), INDIA AND BHUTAN, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ADVICE, HEALTH EDUCATION AND TRAINING. 2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGES COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
HIMALAYAN REGION OF ASIA, BEING NEPAL, CHINA (AND TIBET), INDIA AND BHUTAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window