THE RAINBOW PROJECT PLYMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims are to continue with ongoing aid and support to a specific area in Romania. It is supported by a wide range of volunteers in different capacities. Local small scale fundraising including tabletop sales, coffe mornings and larger organised sales and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Romania
Governance
- 21 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA PUGSLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hazel McCartney | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Joyce Brumpton | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|||||
BERNADETTE MASSEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.61k | £16.14k | £22.56k | £28.59k | £25.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.42k | £16.24k | £25.72k | £21.82k | £25.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 31 December 2024 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 411 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 25 AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ORPHANS, WIDOWS, THE SICK AND THE POOR OF EASTERN EUROPE IN THE FIRST INSTANCE BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BY DELIVERING HUMANITARIAN AID SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE IN PARTICULAR EASTERN EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 FURZEHATT WAY
PLYMOUTH
PL9 8LP
- Phone:
- 01752401260
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window