THE JOHN HOLT CANCER FOUNDATION (WARRINGTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local Cancer Support for anyone affected by cancer We offer informal & friendly sessions Please contact for update on our weekly 'get together' Due to COVID now working out in the community with our members Our services slowly redeveloping. We currently offer:- One to One Support Signpost Information Social & Activities Peer Support Helpline is available for Patients Family Carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Total income includes £1,025 from government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warrington
Governance
- 13 October 2005: Standard registration
- JHCF (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS CHRIS HOLT | Chair | 12 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Claire Prach | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.44k | £43.41k | £56.52k | £59.46k | £51.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.95k | £43.18k | £56.27k | £65.84k | £80.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £1.02k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 719 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 719 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1084 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1084 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1449 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1449 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1814 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1814 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE FOUNDATION ARE:- A) TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES OR FRIENDS; B) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO CANCER AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; AND C) TO SUPPORT ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE RELATING TO THE FIGHT AGAINST CANCER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE WARRINGTON, CHESHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Woodhouse Close
Birchwood
Warrington
WA3 6QP
- Phone:
- 07909230118
- Email:
- JHCSF6688@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window