GOOD FOOD MATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support disadvantaged young people to build healthier lifestyles, focusing on those facing lack of achievement at school, exclusion, in care, caring for relatives, ex-offenders or those at risk from antisocial behaviour, those going through transition, & those involved in teaching or providing nutrition to youth in the UK. Our key message is that good food does matter!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £92,097 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 08 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLE SHORT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alexandra Kent | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Mills | Trustee | 10 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.53k | £76.49k | £76.75k | £111.17k | £103.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.20k | £121.60k | £128.44k | £165.59k | £114.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.49k | £40.61k | £53.76k | £32.33k | £92.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 08 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE:- (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF COOKING AND GROWING HEALTHY FOOD. (B) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE SO THAT THEY CAN DEVELOP HEALTHIER LIFESTYLES IN PARTICULAR THOSE FACING LACK OF ACHIEVEMENT AT SCHOOL, EXCLUSION, IN CARE, CARING FOR RELATIVES, EX-OFFENDERS OR THOSE AT RISK FROM ANTISOCIAL BEHAVIOUR AS WELL AS DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN GOING THROUGH TRANSITION AND THOSE INVOLVED IN TEACHING OR PROVIDING NUTRITION TO SAID PEOPLE, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (C) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY ENCOURAGING THE DEVELOPMENT OF HEALTHIER LIFESTYLES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL TRAINING, EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT ON NUTRITION, HEALTH AND WELL-BEING TO ENSURE SAID PEOPLE DEVELOP MORE POSITIVE ATTITUDES TO HEALTH AND EQUIPPING THEM TO MAKE MORE INFORMED HEALTH AND DIETARY CHOICES LEADING TO AN IMPROVEMENT IN THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON IN PARTICULAR CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Mickleham Way
New Addington
CROYDON
CR0 0PN
- Phone:
- 07715905033
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window