GREYHOUND GAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue, rehab/re-homing of greyhounds and lurchers and any other animal. The charity is still open for the purposes of receipt of legacies that were pledged during the period when the charity was active. On receipt of any legacies the Trustees will distribute in accordance with the wishes of the estate to the new trust Greyhound GAP CIO 1158499 to which operations were transferred on 30/09/14.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 March 2006: Standard registration
- GAP (Working name)
- GG (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA CARTWRIGHT | Chair | 19 July 2018 |
|
|||||
ANNETTE PEMBERTON | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Edwards | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS , IN PARTICULAR GREYHOUNDS AND LURCHERS, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR GREYHOUNDS AND LURCHERS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AN TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY AND EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grindle Stone Edge House
Cobmoor Road
Kidsgrove
Stoke-on-Trent
ST7 3PZ
- Phone:
- 07917422489
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window