EPIPHANY CHRISTIAN FAITH MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teach, preach,fundraise,support,counsell,equip,enable,empower
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Burma
- India
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Uganda
Governance
- 07 October 2005: Standard registration
- 01 May 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- E.C.F.M. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.34k | £6.43k | £2.60k | £374 | £2.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.42k | £3.19k | £5.66k | £370 | £2.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 12 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 17 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 21 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 12 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ATTACHED STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN PARTICULAR IN BOURNEMOUTH AND IN SUCH OTHER AREAS OF THE UK OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, WORSHIP SERVICES, PROVIDING RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION, COUNSELLING AND PASTORAL CARE, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS DESCRIBED IN THE ATTACHED STATEMENT OF BELIEFS. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN KERRALA, INDIA BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
BOURNEMOUTH (UK) AND KERRALA (INDIA)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window