MIRACLE CHRISTIAN CENTRE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion in the United Kingdom and overseas, and to relieve persons in conditions of poverty, sickness and distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
- Venezuela
Governance
- 26 September 2005: Standard registration
- 06 October 2023: Funds received from 1081792 BREAD OF LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE
- MCCI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Anthony McLeod | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marlene Anderson | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Ebenezer Kofi Okai | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NGOMA | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN MILLIE-JAMES | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev NISHEL NIEL ROACH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.70k | £198.31k | £194.55k | £177.70k | £137.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.07k | £139.25k | £145.55k | £60.29k | £164.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, AND TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 2
CAPITAL BUSINESS PARK
MANOR WAY
BOREHAMWOOD
WD6 1GW
- Phone:
- 02082368500
- Email:
- admin@mccichurch.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window