Accounts and annual returns THE TERENCE MILLS TRUST

Charity number: 1111446
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not submitted