THE WOLVES AND HUMANS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wolves and Humans is a UK based charity working with people and local communities to find practical solutions to co-existence with wolves and other large carnivores, thereby helping long-term conservation of these species.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Belarus
- France
- Latvia
- Poland
- Portugal
- Russia
- Scotland
- Slovakia
- Spain
Governance
- 13 September 2005: Standard registration
- WOLVES AND HUMANS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ROBERT HOWIE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TROY BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATIE-LOUISE MORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/06/2020 | 03/06/2021 | 03/06/2022 | 03/06/2023 | 03/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.84k | £5.23k | £7.52k | £7.82k | £4.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.27k | £2.51k | £10.19k | £8.32k | £3.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 June 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON 6TH JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE METHODS OF MANAGING CONFLICT BETWEEN WOLVES (AND OTHER LARGE CARNIVORES) AND AGRICULTURE AND OTHER HUMAN INTERESTS. B) TO PROVIDE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION ABOUT WOLVES (AND OTHER LARGE CARNIVORES) TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND ADVANCE THE SCIENTIFIC STUDY OF WOLVES AND OTHER LARGE CARNIVORES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL CREST
LONGDOWN
EXETER
EX6 7SR
- Phone:
- 01392811130
- Email:
- info@wolvesandhumans.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window