Accounts and annual returns THE FRONTLINE CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1111898
Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 March 2025 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 March 2025 408 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 January 2024 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 January 2024 349 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2023 656 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 November 2023 656 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2022 416 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2022 416 days late Download Open in new window