THE RICHARD CLARKE FIRST SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PTFA organises fund raising schemes such as fun runs, school discos, school calendar etc in order to generate funds that can be spent to benefit the children of the school. Recent expenditure has included buying new books for school, a new shed and the completion of a "Quiet Garden."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 31 August 2005: Standard registration
- THE RICHARD CLARKE FORST SCHOOL PTFA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Dear | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Georgie Hine | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Gavin | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Gray | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.29k | £4.18k | £4.33k | £6.74k | £5.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.27k | £4.33k | £5.40k | £5.44k | £6.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 October 2024 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 August 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED 29 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RICHARD CLARKE COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL
SCHOOL HOUSE LANE
ABBOTS BROMLEY
RUGELEY
WS15 3BT
- Phone:
- 01283 840206
- Email:
- rcfs.ws15.ptfa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window