DEEP RELEASE BURSARY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Christian charity providing specialist training in Deep Release counselling and psychotherapy. We subsidise in-house and external training courses which focus on specialisms such as pre-and perinatal psychotherapy, trauma work and the release of blocked emotions. Counselling bursaries are also available for those who are receiving therapy with a Deep Release counsellor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Regina Riley | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ALLDAY | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Mrs Sally Nash | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE WALDRON | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL CLARE BARTON | Trustee | 27 January 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.07k | £9.97k | £7.99k | £3.48k | £4.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £11.31k | £6.78k | £6.74k | £4.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON 17TH JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 22ND OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, AMONG PERSONS SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF EMOTIONAL PSYCHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF SUCH CONDITIONS BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE AND MEETING THE COST OF COUNSELLING OR THERAPY AND BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION WHERE REQUIRED. 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELDS OF COUNSELLING AND THERAPY, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN ACCESSING APPROPRIATE TRAINING COURSES FOR THOSE WHO COULD NOT OTHERWISE MEET THE COSTS THROUGH THEIR OWN RESOURCES AND BY FACILITATING THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF RELEVANT EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS TO BOTH COUNSELLORS AND THOSE RECEIVING TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
THE UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 Deaconsfield Road
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP3 9HZ
- Phone:
- 01442266706
- Email:
- info@deeprelease.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window