MATHETEUO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Matheteuo focuses on resourcing and enabling theological education by extension training initiatives to serve fast growing churches overseas as well as Christian communities in cultures where it is dangerous to profess openly the Christian faith. The trustees also recognise an enormous need in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Throughout London
- Indonesia
- Kazakhstan
- Kyrgyzstan
- Malaysia
- Nepal
- Philippines
- Russia
- Tajikistan
- Uzbekistan
Governance
- 21 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RT REVD COLIN FREDERICK BAZLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN TREVOR EDWIN HIGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.46k | £8.72k | £8.89k | £8.79k | £8.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.52k | £9.16k | £8.81k | £9.16k | £9.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, ATTACHED AS A SCHEDULE, THROUGH THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. TO DEVELOP AN INTER-CULTURAL CHRISTIAN THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION BY EXTENSION (TEE) CURRICULUM FOR CONTEXTUALISATION AMONG SPECIFIC CULTURAL TRADITIONS FOR 'EQUIPPING FOR MINISTRIES' AND 'DISCIPLE FORMATION'. 2. TO CONDUCT SEMINARS AND WORKSHOPS: A. TO FACILITATE CONTEXTUALISATION OF INTER-CULTURAL CURRICULUM AND TRAINING FOR SPECIFIC CULTURAL TRADITIONS. B. TO ADMINISTER DEPLOYMENT OF CONTEXTUALISED CURRICULUM FOR VARIOUS NATIONAL PROGRAMMES. C. TO ENSURE A SOUND AND EFFECTIVE ADMINISTRATION OF NATIONAL PROGRAMMES. 3. TO ESTABLISH AND MANAGE A 'SEED FUND' FOR THE LAUNCHING OF NATIONAL PROGRAMMES. 4. TO ESTABLISH A 'GLOBAL TRAINING CENTRE FOR MENTORING AND DISCIPLESHIP', THE REGISTERED OFFICE BEING AT WEYCROFT HALL, AXMINSTER, UK: A. TO ADMINISTER DEPLOYMENT OF RESOURCES FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF NATIONAL PROGRAMMES. B. TO PROVIDE A FORUM FOR AN ACTIVE INTERACTION WITHIN THE GLOBAL NET-WORK OF NATIONAL PROGRAMMES. C. TO FACILITATE AND OVERSEE THE INITIAL TRAINING REQUIRED FOR THE FULFILMENT OF THE OBJECTIVES. 5. TO SEEK ACTIVE CO-OPERATION FROM MINISTRY ORGANIZATIONS, GLOBAL AND NATIONAL, WITH A VISION REFLECTING, PRIMARILY, ACTIVE FULFILMENT OF THE 'GREAT COMMISSION' AS PER MATHEW 28:19-20 THE MINISTRY OF MATHETEUO IS INTERDENOMINATIONAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 TEESDALE ROAD
WIRRAL
CH63 3AS
- Phone:
- 07875091831
- Email:
- bryantehiggins@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window