Accounts and annual returns THE WHOLE HOG CELEBRATORY ARTS

Charity number: 1111196
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 21 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 26 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 20 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 29 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 29 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 31 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 31 October 2007 On Time