CARIBBEAN VILLAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A policy development approach to addressing the challenges and assisting in the problem solving of the economic and social conditions of the Caribbean countries of operation listed. Also a hands-on approach to assistance given to grass roots and communities based organisations for the development of local villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 September 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Barbados
- Cuba
- Dominica
- Grenada
- Haiti
- Jamaica
- Saint Vincent
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Trinidad And Tobago
Governance
- 11 November 2005: Standard registration
- CARVIT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERALD JENNER LA TOUCHE JP | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/09/2019 | 08/09/2020 | 08/09/2021 | 08/09/2022 | 08/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 September 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 September 2020 | 17 May 2022 | 313 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 September 2019 | 25 September 2020 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN THE CARIBBEAN WHO ARE IN NEED AND TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THOSE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
THE CARIBBEAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
213 MONTAGUE ROAD
SMETHWICK
B66 4PN
- Phone:
- 01212081928
- Email:
- geraldlatouche@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window