CITYCOAST TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Activities Education/Training Relief of Poverty Religious Activities Community Development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 September 2005: Standard registration
- CHRISTIAN OUTREACH CENTRE - BRIGHTON AND HOVE (Previous name)
- CITYCOAST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Harland | Chair | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Howarth | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Spicer | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £617.62k | £477.05k | £470.28k | £484.72k | £432.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £606.52k | £401.99k | £428.73k | £469.57k | £432.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £396.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £108.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £112.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £606.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAY 2007 AND 23 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DECLARATION OF FAITH (SET OUT IN SCHEDULE 1 TO THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION) IN PARTICULAR NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING BY: 3.1.1 WORSHIPPING, PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES, FELLOWSHIP, AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE, TEACHING IN ALL FORMS OF MEDIA, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH GENERALLY; 3.1.2 THE INSTRUCTION AND CARE OF CHRISTIANS INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN; 3.1.3 THE EVANGELISATION OF NON-CHRISTIANS 3.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 3.2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, POVERTY OR DISTRESS OR AGED OR SICK. 3.3. TO PROMOTE SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE VOLUNTARY ACTIVITIES THAT ADVANCE EDUCATION, CULTURE AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE AND PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, BRIGHTON AND HOVE AND AREAS OF BENEFIT WHERE WE CAN MAKE A DIFFERENCE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Citycoast Church
North Street
Portslade
Brighton
BN41 1DG
- Phone:
- 01273433433
- Email:
- hello@citycoast.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window