Financial history THE KOOL KIDS CLUB

Charity number: 1111227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £173.78k £138.55k £183.44k £199.07k £201.86k
Total expenditure £144.60k £144.15k £162.09k £162.56k £186.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £53.68k N/A N/A N/A