Accounts and annual returns MEYNELL KINDERGARTEN

Charity number: 1111307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 11 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 02 May 2024 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 02 May 2024 126 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 01 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 01 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 20 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 04 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 29 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window