SWISS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Swiss Benevolent Society offers help, advice and support to Swiss nationals living in Great Britain. Its Office is based in Central London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Egloff | Chair | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Federico Sassoli de Bianchi | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marc Peter | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.74k | £21.93k | £91.66k | £45.02k | £45.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.07k | £47.05k | £48.37k | £60.92k | £54.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JUNE 2005 as amended on 05 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE THE ASSISTANCE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION AS TO CREED, OF SWISS CITIZENS IN NEED OF HELP WHO ARE TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY RESIDENT IN THE CONSULAR DISTRICT OF THE SWISS EMBASSY IN LONDON OR, IN SPECIAL CASES, SWISS CITIZENS IN NEED OF HELP WHO ARE TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY RESIDENT ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
THE CONSULAR DISTRICT OF THE SWISS EMBASSY IN LONDON OR IN SPECIAL CASES UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 Endell Street
London
London
WC2H 9DY
- Phone:
- 02078369119
- Email:
- info@swissbenevolent.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window