Financial history CHARISMATIC EVANGELISTIC MINISTRY UK

Charity Number: 1111761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £150.95k £85.71k £129.66k £145.45k £169.81k
Total expenditure £120.08k £61.02k £86.77k £123.29k £139.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A