WATERSIDE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice and information on a range of issues including benefits and welfare rights, consumer issues, employment and housing rights, legal issues, money and debt.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 26 September 2005: Standard registration
- 27 September 2011: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 27 September 2011: Funds transferred to 1132425 CITIZENS ADVICE NEW FOREST
- WATERSIDE ( HYTHE) CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.17k | £54.97k | £66.05k | £70.68k | £70.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.98k | £59.68k | £52.39k | £66.80k | £100.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 25 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 25 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 21 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 21 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 18 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 18 December 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN (THE WATERSIDE PARISHES OF THE NEW FOREST HAMPSHIRE) AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
THE WATERSIDE PARISHES OF THE NEW FOREST HAMPSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window