NOAH'S ARK @ CRBC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in accordance with Christian principles and particularly by providing Christian based high quality early-years education as a service to the local community together with parenting support for the families involved
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £204,751 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Bristol City
Governance
- 10 November 2005: Standard registration
- NOAH'S ARK PRE-SCHOOL/PLAYTIME/STAY & PLAY (Working name)
- NOAH'S ARK@CRBC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Elizabeth Burkill | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Markelian Mico | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Holden | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
RICHARD FEATHER | Trustee | 30 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELEN WILSON | Trustee | 30 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
AILSA BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.10k | £262.85k | £266.15k | £308.84k | £306.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.61k | £248.58k | £277.71k | £283.21k | £293.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £161.57k | £152.75k | £146.85k | £200.52k | £204.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN BRISTOL AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING CHRISTIAN-BASED HIGH QUALITY EARLY-YEARS EDUCATION AS A SERVICE TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY TOGETHER WITH PARENTING SUPPORT FOR THE FAMILIES INVOLVED.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Noah's Ark Preschool
CAIRNS ROAD
BRISTOL
BS6 7TH
- Phone:
- 01179446229
- Email:
- office@noahsarkps.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window