DUNAMIS INTERNATIONAL GOSPEL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Embark on evangelical missions and programmes with a view to winning soul for the Lord Jesus. Organise bible studies, teachings, seminars, discussions,revivals and any other programme to facilitate the study, meaning and learning of the Holy Bible. Embark upon the planting, establishment or building of churches, chapels or any other place of christian worship in any part of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Kent
- Milton Keynes
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Benin
- Liberia
- Nigeria
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 15 September 2005: Standard registration
- DESTINY HOUSE (Working name)
- DIGC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paul Idoko Enenche | Chair | 05 August 2005 |
|
|
||||
DOGIYE WORIPAGA | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
DARLINGTON ATOMRE | Trustee | 21 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
IVY ORIEJI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.64k | £200.70k | £251.07k | £273.00k | £499.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.22k | £101.42k | £163.60k | £284.88k | £383.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON 5TH AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON, UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIGC UK ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE
28 Ayletts Avenue.
BASILDON
SS14 1UL
- Phone:
- 07877640050
- Email:
- Atomre@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window